Global Patent Index - EP 1834623 A3

EP 1834623 A3 2009-02-11 - Multi-chamber container

Title (en)

Multi-chamber container

Title (de)

Mehrkammerbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient multi-chambre

Publication

EP 1834623 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07004952 A

Priority

US 37518806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1834623A2] A multi-chamber container of the present invention is divided into a plurality of filling chambers 11, 12 by a seal 13, and has a container body 1 with the chambers 11, 12 filled with respective solutions, and a cover 2 that covers at least one of the chambers 11, 12 of the container body 1. The cover 2 includes a pair of rigid members 21 that sandwich the seal portion 13 from the outside, and seal portions 22 provided to close the rigid members 21. In this multi-chamber container, the cover 2 is held when the filling chambers 11, 12 are not opened in therebetween, while being dropped easily when the filling chambers 11, 12 are opened in therebetween and the thickness of the seal portion 13 increases.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/2093 (2013.01); A61J 1/10 (2013.01); A61J 1/2024 (2015.05); A61J 1/2034 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1834623 A2 20070919; EP 1834623 A3 20090211; EP 1834623 B1 20120418; AU 2007200955 A1 20070927; AU 2007200955 B2 20121025; HK 1102541 A1 20120824; JP 2007244864 A 20070927; JP 5361138 B2 20131204; US 2007209951 A1 20070913

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602007022042

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150304

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-05-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007022042

- Effective date: 20130121

2013-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130121

2012-08-24 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1102541

2012-06-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007022042

- Effective date: 20120621

2012-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-04-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-09-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61J 1/20 20060101AFI20110815BHEP

2011-08-15 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602007022042

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61J0001000000

- IPC: A61J0001200000

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-11-30 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1102541

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU