Global Patent Index - EP 1834892 A3

EP 1834892 A3 2007-10-03 - Dispensing closure with tamper evident lid panel

Title (en)

Dispensing closure with tamper evident lid panel

Title (de)

Spenderverschluss mit manipulationssicherem Deckel

Title (fr)

Obturation avec panneau de couvercle anti-sabotage

Publication

EP 1834892 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07012515 A

Priority

  • EP 01952883 A
  • US 59742700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6269986B1] A closure structure for a container includes a body having a containing wall for closing the container, the containing wall having a dispensing orifice. A lid is operatively associated with the containing wall to cover the dispensing orifice in a closed position and uncover the dispensing orifice when the lid is moved away from the closed position. In one embodiment, a tamper-indicating member includes a press portion connected by a hinge to the lid, and an anchor portion connected to the body, the press portion connected at a frangible junction to the anchor portion, whereby the press portion can be moved sufficiently relative to the body to separate the press portion from the anchor portion. The anchor portion is connected to the body by an anchor member extending radially from the body. The anchor portion includes an aperture. The body includes a radially extending head which captures the aperture when the anchor portion is pressed to the body. The head can be flattened to make the connection between the anchor portion and the body more secure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/34 (2006.01); B65D 47/10 (2006.01); B65D 47/06 (2006.01); B65D 47/08 (2006.01); B65D 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/0804 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6269986 B1 20010807; AR 030235 A1 20030813; AU 2001273593 B2 20050224; AU 7359301 A 20020102; BR 0111527 A 20030722; CA 2405639 A1 20011227; CA 2405639 C 20080819; CN 100450883 C 20090114; CN 101357702 A 20090204; CN 1222445 C 20051012; CN 1449346 A 20031015; CN 1651317 A 20050810; CZ 20024145 A3 20040414; DE 60129959 D1 20070927; DE 60129959 T2 20071213; DE 60139519 D1 20090917; EP 1292508 A1 20030319; EP 1292508 A4 20060201; EP 1292508 B1 20070815; EP 1834892 A2 20070919; EP 1834892 A3 20071003; EP 1834892 B1 20090805; EP 1955963 A1 20080813; ES 2288970 T3 20080201; ES 2328639 T3 20091116; HK 1056861 A1 20060707; JP 2003535781 A 20031202; MX PA02010416 A 20030425; PL 204847 B1 20100226; PL 365756 A1 20050110; RU 2271324 C2 20060310; WO 0198168 A1 20011227

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60139519

- Effective date: 20130101

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110618

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110618

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100619

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100618

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100507

2009-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2328639 T3

2009-09-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60139519 P 20090917

2009-08-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1292508 P

2009-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-08-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROSS, RICHARD A.

2009-03-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 47/10 20060101AFI20090217BHEP

2009-03-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 55/02 20060101ALI20090217BHEP

2009-03-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 47/08 20060101ALN20090217BHEP

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070626

2007-09-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1292508 P

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT