Global Patent Index - EP 1835640 A3

EP 1835640 A3 2007-10-31 - Optical receiver and optical reception method compatible with differential quadrature phase shift keying

Title (en)

Optical receiver and optical reception method compatible with differential quadrature phase shift keying

Title (de)

Zur Differenzphasenumtastung passender optischer Empfänger und optisches Empfangsverfahren

Title (fr)

Récepteur optique et procédé de réception optique compatible avec la modulation de phase différentielle décalée en quadrature

Publication

EP 1835640 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07012842 A

Priority

  • EP 05009496 A
  • JP 2005023741 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1686707A2] In an optical receiver according to the present invention, an input signal light subjected to the differential quadrature phase shift keying (DQPSK) is incident on a PANDA type fiber in a linearly polarized state by 45°, so that a delay time difference corresponding to one symbol is generated between orthogonal polarization components in the DQPSK signal light, and then, the signal light is branched by a half mirror into two, to be sent to first and second paths respectively, thereby giving, by a 1/4 wave plate disposed on one of the paths, a relative birefringent amount difference of À/2 between the lights propagated through the respective paths. Then, each of the lights propagated through the first and second paths is separated into two orthogonal polarization components by a polarization beam splitter, and the respective polarization components are received by a differential reception circuit so that in-phase components and quadrature components in the DQPSK signal are demodulated. Thus, a small sized and low cost optical receiver capable of stably demodulating the DQPSK signal is provided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/40 (2013.01); G02F 2/00 (2006.01); H04B 10/25 (2013.01); H04B 10/50 (2013.01); H04B 10/516 (2013.01); H04B 10/548 (2013.01); H04B 10/60 (2013.01); H04B 10/61 (2013.01); H04B 10/67 (2013.01); H04B 10/69 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/61 (2013.01); H04B 10/532 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1686707 A2 20060802; EP 1686707 A3 20060809; EP 1686707 B1 20090624; CN 100558015 C 20091104; CN 1815930 A 20060809; DE 602005015075 D1 20090806; DE 602005016157 D1 20091001; EP 1835640 A2 20070919; EP 1835640 A3 20071031; EP 1835640 B1 20090819; JP 2006211538 A 20060810; JP 4170298 B2 20081022; US 2006171718 A1 20060803; US 2010189437 A1 20100729; US 7529490 B2 20090505; US 7860394 B2 20101228

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160429

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602005016157

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-04-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100520

2009-10-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005016157 P 20091001

2009-08-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1686707 P

2009-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-08-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071120

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-09-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1686707 P

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB