Global Patent Index - EP 1837598 A3

EP 1837598 A3 2007-10-10 - Domestic gas oven and method of lighting at least one gas burner in such a domestic gas oven

Title (en)

Domestic gas oven and method of lighting at least one gas burner in such a domestic gas oven

Title (de)

Gasbackofen für den Hausgebrauch und Verfahren zum Zünden mindestens eines Gasbrenners in einem solchen Gasbackofen für den Hausgebrauch

Title (fr)

Four de cuisson domestique à gaz et procédé d'allumage d'au moins un brûleur à gaz dans un tel four de cuisson domestique à gaz

Publication

EP 1837598 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 07104731 A

Priority

FR 0602856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1837598A2] The oven has a gas burner (9) to heat a cooking chamber (2), and a grill element (10) e.g. electric grill, mounted on the chamber. A solenoid valve is mounted upstream of the chamber on a gas supplying pipe (22). A control unit (15) controls closing and opening of the valve for supplying the gas. An electric ignition unit (14) e.g. incandescent element, ignites the burner. The unit (15) controls the unit (14) adapted to select a cooking mode (23) to ignite and maintain the unit (14) during a cooking cycle. The unit (14) ignites/switch off the element to regulate temperature of the chamber. An independent claim is also included for a method for igniting a gas burner in a domestic gas oven.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/12 (2006.01); F24C 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/103 (2013.01); F24C 1/04 (2013.01); F24C 3/087 (2013.01); F24C 3/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1837598 A2 20070926; EP 1837598 A3 20071010; FR 2898962 A1 20070928; FR 2898962 B1 20080509

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-11 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-04-22 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20140411

2015-04-22 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

2013-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

2011-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080610

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080409

2007-10-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DOMESTIC GAS OVEN AND IGNITION METHOD OF AT LEAST ONE GAS BURNER IN SUCH A DOMESTIC GAS OVEN

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU