Global Patent Index - EP 1838193 A1

EP 1838193 A1 2007-10-03 - A CONTAINER

Title (en)

A CONTAINER

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 1838193 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05793877 A

Priority

  • GB 2005003996 W
  • GB 0423515 A
  • GB 0509289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006043042A1] A container comprising a body (1), a lid (5) for the body (1), and a locking arrangement for securing the lid (5) to the body (1): the locking arrangement comprising a handle (23) which fits around at least a part of the periphery of the lid (5), and at least one locking device which connects the handle (23) to the lid (5) such that the lid (5) is movable by the handle (23), which is such that the locking device locks when the handle (23) is lowered with respect to the lid (5), and which is such that the lifting of the handle (23) away from the lid (5) causes the locking device (4) to unlock.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1615 (2013.01); A47K 13/242 (2013.01); B65D 43/22 (2013.01); B65F 2001/1676 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006043042A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006043042 A1 20060427; AU 2005297041 A1 20060427; AU 2005297041 B2 20110616; CA 2585996 A1 20060427; CA 2585996 C 20131210; EP 1838193 A1 20071003; EP 1838193 B1 20100526; JP 2008516861 A 20080522; JP 5086808 B2 20121128; KR 101313371 B1 20131001; KR 20070083750 A 20070824; NO 20071627 A 20070328; NO 330327 B1 20110328

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20160905

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-09-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100826

2012-09-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101018

2011-12-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005021548

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

2011-06-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005021548

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-03-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E009409

2011-02-28 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-02-28 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-02-28 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-01-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-12-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-11-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100926

2010-11-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-10-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-10-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-10-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2346330 T3

2010-09-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100401968

2010-09-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-09-08 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-08-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-08-24 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20100816

2010-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE S.A.

2010-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005021548 P 20100708

2010-06-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081218

2008-01-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR