Global Patent Index - EP 1838279 A1

EP 1838279 A1 2007-10-03 - AGENTS FOR DYING KERATIN FIBERS

Title (en)

AGENTS FOR DYING KERATIN FIBERS

Title (de)

MITTEL ZUM FÄRBEN VON KERATINHALTIGEN FASERN

Title (fr)

PRODUITS SERVANT A COLORER DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES

Publication

EP 1838279 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06701376 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000171 W
  • DE 102005003121 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077039A1] The invention relates to agents for dying keratin fibers, particularly human hair, containing CH-acid pyrazolo[1,5-a]pyrimidinium derivatives combined with reactive carbonyl compounds. These agents can be used for dying keratin fibers, for revitalizing the color of or adding nuances to already dyed keratin fibers, and in a method for dying keratin fibers, particularly human hair.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/49 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 5/065 (2013.01); A61K 8/4953 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077039A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005003121 A1 20060727; EP 1838279 A1 20071003; WO 2006077039 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080527

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071114

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR