Global Patent Index - EP 1838327 A1

EP 1838327 A1 2007-10-03 - LEUKOCYTE HOMOGENATES HAVING A MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF LESS THAN 10.000 DALTON FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEFECTS OF CELLULAR IMMUNITY

Title (en)

LEUKOCYTE HOMOGENATES HAVING A MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF LESS THAN 10.000 DALTON FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEFECTS OF CELLULAR IMMUNITY

Title (de)

LEUKOZYTENHOMOGENISATE MIT EINEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT KLEINER ALS 10.000 DALTON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEFEKTEN DER ZELLULÄREN IMMUNITÄT MIT

Title (fr)

HOMOGENISATS DE LEUCOCYTES AVEC UN POIDS MOLECULAIRE EN DESSOUS DE 10.000 DALTON DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES DEFAUTS DE L'IMMUNITE CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 1838327 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05794600 A

Priority

  • DE 2005001728 W
  • DE 102004047262 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006032268A1] The invention relates to a composition consisting of proteins, peptides and/or peptide constituents, a pharmaceutical product containing said composition, a method for producing said composition, and the use thereof for the prophylaxis or therapy of people and/or patients with pathogenic modifications and/or defects of cellular immunity, especially cancer, sepsis or allergic reactions, in conjunction with cytostatic therapy, chemotherapy and/or radiotherapy.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 35/15 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 35/15 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006032268A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006032268 A1 20060330; AU 2005287726 A1 20060330; BR PI0517348 A 20081007; CA 2580616 A1 20060330; CN 101056645 A 20071017; DE 102004047262 A1 20060406; EP 1838327 A1 20071003; JP 2008514555 A 20080508; MX 2007003488 A 20070518; RU 2007115380 A 20081027

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081112

2008-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RIEMSER ARZNEIMITTEL AG

2008-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RIEMSER ARZNEIMITTEL AG

2008-07-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LEUKOCYTE HOMOGENATES HAVING A MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF LESS THAN 10.000 DALTON FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEFECTS OF CELLULAR IMMUNITY

2008-01-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TREATMENT OF DEFECTS OF CELLULAR IMMUNITY WITH LEUKOCYTE HOMOGENATES HAVING A MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF LESS THAN 10.000 DALTON

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070424

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR