Global Patent Index - EP 1838339 A2

EP 1838339 A2 2007-10-03 - AGER-PEPTIDES AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

AGER-PEPTIDES AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

AGER-PEPTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES DE PTAG ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1838339 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 06706286 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000420 W
  • DE 102005002353 A
  • US 64521105 P
  • US 66870405 P
  • DE 102005015832 A
  • US 68121105 P
  • DE 102005022285 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077101A2] The invention relates to the identification, functionality and use of domains of the N-terminus of the receptor for Advanced Glycation End Products (AGER). Said domains are highly conserved in all AGER protein sequences, with the designated receptor multimerisation epitop (RME). They represent mediators for the AGER automatic association and heteromerisation with other proteins. The invention also relates to the identification, functionality and use of peptides which are derived from the C-domains of AGER (AGER-CDP). The inventive AGER-RMEs and AGER-CDPs are suitable as targets for identifying AGER-ligands, which modulate natural ligand exchange effects as immunogens for the active or passive immunisation of individuals, as diagnostic means which are used to identify immunogenic reactions, and as peptide ligands which are used to modulate protein-protein-exchange effects involving AGER.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4748 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077101A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

HR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006077101 A2 20060727; WO 2006077101 A3 20060928; EP 1838339 A2 20071003; JP 2008526243 A 20080724

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120404

2009-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090417

2008-04-23 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20070727

- Countries: HR

2008-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAHN, ALFRED

2008-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOEBBERT, RALPH

2008-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TEUSCH, NICOLE

2008-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOELLER, ACHIM

2008-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBERT, ULRICH PROF. DR.

2008-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, MARTIN DR.

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: HR