Global Patent Index - EP 1838396 A1

EP 1838396 A1 2007-10-03 - INERTING METHOD FOR PREVENTING FIRES

Title (en)

INERTING METHOD FOR PREVENTING FIRES

Title (de)

INERTISIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR BRANDVERMEIDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INERTISATION POUR PREVENIR UN INCENDIE

Publication

EP 1838396 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06700499 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000267 W
  • DE 102005002172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006074942A1] The invention relates to an inerting method for preventing fires or explosions in a closed protected area, whereby the oxygen content in the protected area is reduced as compared to the surrounding atmosphere. The aim of the invention is to effectively prevent fires even when gases escape from solids or liquids in closed protected areas. For this purpose, the oxygen content in the closed protected area is controlled if any inflammable substances and/or gases are present in the closed protected area (for example hydrocarbons), depending on the concentration of the inflammable gases.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/00 (2006.01); A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0018 (2013.01); A62C 99/0063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006074942A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006074942 A1 20060720; AT 443543 T 20091015; AU 2006205895 A1 20060720; AU 2006205895 B2 20110331; BR PI0606315 A2 20090616; CA 2594796 A1 20060720; CA 2594796 C 20130716; CN 101119772 A 20080206; CN 101119772 B 20111130; DE 102005002172 A1 20060727; DE 502006004914 D1 20091105; DK 1838396 T3 20100201; EP 1838396 A1 20071003; EP 1838396 B1 20090923; ES 2333813 T3 20100301; HK 1108399 A1 20100115; JP 2008526409 A 20080724; JP 4654249 B2 20110316; KR 101255387 B1 20130417; KR 20070102512 A 20071018; MX 2007008408 A 20071121; NO 20074209 L 20071009; NO 339355 B1 20161205; PT 1838396 E 20091130; RU 2007131271 A 20090227; RU 2362600 C2 20090727; TW 200702015 A 20070116; UA 90126 C2 20100412; US 2010012334 A1 20100121

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-03-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: DUFOURSTRASSE 116, 8008 ZUERICH (CH)

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-11-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-11-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160114

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160803

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160713

2016-11-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-10-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160114

2016-10-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090402868

- Effective date: 20160803

2016-10-03 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 6596

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-08-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-08-15 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E003598

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-08-10 [REG LT MM4D] LAPSE EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20160113

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-05-29 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20150112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20150112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20150113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20150113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-01-30 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-01-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100624

2010-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-06-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E007389

2010-04-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100123

2010-04-07 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 6596

2010-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2333813 T3

2010-02-26 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-02-26 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-02-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-01-15 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1108399

2010-01-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090402868

2009-12-15 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E003598

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-12-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-12-07 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2009-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-11-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006004914 P 20091105

2009-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2009-10-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-09 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1108399

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070611

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR