Global Patent Index - EP 1838500 A1

EP 1838500 A1 2007-10-03 - SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (en)

SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHALTVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION

Publication

EP 1838500 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05763069 A

Priority

  • EP 2005053221 W
  • DE 102004045117 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006029916A1] The invention relates to a switching device comprising a rotatably mounted control element (10) and an eccentric element (12) for translating a rotational displacement (14) of the control element (10) into a translational displacement (16) of a switching element (18), in particular a selector shaft of a hand tool. According to the invention, the shape of the eccentric element (12) differs significantly from that of a rod.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/00 (2006.01); G05G 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 16/006 (2013.01); B25F 5/001 (2013.01); B25D 2216/0015 (2013.01); B25D 2216/0023 (2013.01); B25D 2216/0038 (2013.01); B25D 2250/045 (2013.01); B25D 2250/371 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006029916A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 102004045117 A1 20060323; CN 101022925 A 20070822; CN 101022925 B 20100929; EP 1838500 A1 20071003; US 2007102174 A1 20070510; US 7395872 B2 20080708; WO 2006029916 A1 20060323

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170404

2016-12-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161122

2011-05-25 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20070417

2007-12-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-12-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI