Global Patent Index - EP 1838578 A2

EP 1838578 A2 2007-10-03 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FLEXIBLE TUBES FROM A FLAT FILM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FLEXIBLE TUBES FROM A FLAT FILM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHLÄUCHEN AUS EINER FLACHFOLIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE BOYAUX A PARTIR D'UN FILM PLAT

Publication

EP 1838578 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 05823535 A

Priority

  • EP 2005056471 W
  • DE 102004062025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006069892A2] The invention concerns a device for producing flexible tubes from a flat film material (2). Said device comprises a first substantially concave cylinder (4), a second substantially concave cylinder (5), a forming pipe (3) arranged between the first and the second cylinders and a longitudinal sealing device (7) enabling a longitudinal weld seam of the flexible tube to be sealed. The substantially concave cylinders (4, 5) comprise respectively a plurality of different discs (4a, 4b, 4c, 4d), said different discs of the cylinders (4, 5) being respectively mounted freely rotatable.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/2042 (2013.01); B65B 9/2035 (2013.01); B65B 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006069892A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006069892 A2 20060706; WO 2006069892 A3 20060824; DE 102004062025 A1 20060713; EP 1838578 A2 20071003; EP 1838578 B1 20120215; US 2008261792 A1 20081023

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141205

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-03-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502005012451

- Effective date: 20121116

2013-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121116

2012-04-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502005012451

- Effective date: 20120405

2012-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2012-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-08-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110721

2008-04-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-04-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070723

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT