Global Patent Index - EP 1838586 A2

EP 1838586 A2 2007-10-03 - FOOD PACK AND FOOD PACKAGING SYSTEM COMPRISING AT LEAST TWO SUCH FOOD PACKS

Title (en)

FOOD PACK AND FOOD PACKAGING SYSTEM COMPRISING AT LEAST TWO SUCH FOOD PACKS

Title (de)

LEBENSMITTELPACKUNG UND MINDESTENS ZWEI SOLCHE LEBENSMITTELPACKUNGEN UMFASSENDES LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE ET SYSTEME D'EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE COMPRENANT AU MOINS DEUX EMBALLAGES DE CE TYPE

Publication

EP 1838586 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 05805006 A

Priority

  • FR 2005002997 W
  • FR 0412756 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2878509A1] The package has a cover with large and various indications. A tray (15) has two support points (25, 26) formed by a reduced zone of a free end (22) of an assembling rim (21). The tray has two support points (27, 28) arranged closer to an average base plane than plane of upper side of the tray. The support points (25-28) form a polygon above which centre of gravity of the package is located. An independent claim is also included for a food packaging system including food packages.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/0204 (2013.01); B65D 2207/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006059010A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2878509 A1 20060602; FR 2878509 B1 20081024; EP 1838586 A2 20071003; WO 2006059010 A2 20060608; WO 2006059010 A3 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110701

2008-03-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EL GHOUYEL, KARIM

2007-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PIETTE, BENOIT

2007-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070926

2007-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPAGNIE GERVAIS DANONE

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070626

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR