Global Patent Index - EP 1838588 A2

EP 1838588 A2 2007-10-03 - FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE EINES FLUIDPRODUKTS

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE.

Publication

EP 1838588 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 05824240 A

Priority

  • FR 2005051023 W
  • FR 0452844 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006059046A2] The invention relates to a fluid product dispensing assembly. The inventive assembly consists of: an external container (1) which is equipped with an opening, said container comprising an internal wall defining an internal space; an internal lining (2) which is disposed in the internal space; and a dispensing member (4), such as a pump, which is used to dispense the fluid product. The invention is characterised in that the assembly also comprises a barrier envelope (3) which is intended to contain the fluid product and which is disposed inside the aforementioned internal lining (2), such that the fluid product does not come into contact with the internal lining (2). The invention is also characterised in that the container (1) is made from a transparent or translucent material, such as glass, such that the internal lining (2) is visible through the container. The invention is further characterised in that the internal lining (2) is substantially opaque so as to mask the above-mentioned barrier envelope (3) at least partially and preferably completely.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 23/02 (2006.01); A45D 34/02 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 23/02 (2013.01); A45D 34/02 (2013.01); B05B 11/0037 (2013.01); B05B 11/0043 (2013.01); A45D 2034/005 (2013.01); A45D 2200/053 (2013.01); A45D 2200/057 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006059046A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006059046 A2 20060608; WO 2006059046 A3 20070215; DE 602005023660 D1 20101028; EP 1838588 A2 20071003; EP 1838588 B1 20100915; ES 2349596 T3 20110105; FR 2878835 A1 20060609; FR 2878835 B1 20080704; US 2008011778 A1 20080117; US 8074839 B2 20111213

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005023660

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-01-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101222

2010-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005023660 P 20101028

2010-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2010-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090513

2008-03-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RONSIN, HERVE

2007-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TROSSAT, JULIEN

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RONSIN, HERVE

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TROSSAT, JULIEN

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT