Global Patent Index - EP 1838610 A1

EP 1838610 A1 2007-10-03 - VITAMIN C EMITTING FILTER

Title (en)

VITAMIN C EMITTING FILTER

Title (de)

VITAMIN C ABGEBENDER FILTER

Title (fr)

FILTRE EMETTEUR DE VITAMINE C

Publication

EP 1838610 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04808275 A

Priority

KR 2004003144 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006059812A1] The method/device/apparatus includes a vitamin C emitting filter, a manufacturing method thereof and a use thereof are disclosed. The vitamin C emitting filter can be manufactured by immersing the carrier in a mixed solution of the silver and the vitamin C or spraying the mixed solution of the silver and the vitamin C onto the carrier. Also, the vitamin C emitting filter can be manufactured by coating a carrier with a silver and coating a vitamin C on the carrier coated with the silver by processing a vitamin C in the carrier. Accordingly, the vitamin C emitting filter can provide the antibacterial function without influence on the property of the vitamin C and can constantly emit the vitamin C in air.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/76 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 9/00 (2013.01); A01N 59/16 (2013.01); B01D 46/0028 (2013.01); B01D 2279/50 (2013.01); B01D 2279/65 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 59/16 + A01N 25/34
  2. A01N 59/16 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006059812A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006059812 A1 20060608; CN 101102961 A 20080109; EP 1838610 A1 20071003; KR 100930323 B1 20091208; KR 20070089686 A 20070831

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090910

2008-03-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEE, SEONG HWAN,WOOSUNG APT.

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEE, SUNG HWA,502-1304, SUNGWON APT.,

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HYUN, OK CHUN,GUDEOK DAELIM APT.

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR