Global Patent Index - EP 1838678 A1

EP 1838678 A1 2007-10-03 - PROCESS FOR OBTAINING CIZOLIRTINE AND ITS ENANTIOMERS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR OBTAINING CIZOLIRTINE AND ITS ENANTIOMERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON CIZOLIRTIN UND SEINEN ENANTIOMEREN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION DE CIZOLIRTINE ET DE SES ÉNANTIOMÈRES

Publication

EP 1838678 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05822912 A

Priority

  • EP 2005013827 W
  • EP 04380266 A
  • US 4163705 A
  • EP 05077140 A
  • EP 05822912 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006063861A1] A process is described for the preparation of a precursor alcohol of Cizolirtine, (±)-2-[phenyl(1-methyl-1H-pyrazol-5-yl)methoxy]-N,N-dimethylethanamine and its enantiomers, it comprises the asymmetric addition of a metalated phenyl reagent to a pyrazolcarbaldehyde in the presence of a chiral ligand to render chiral alcohols. The chiral alcohols are further O-alkylated to render Cizolirtine or its enantiomers.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 231/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006063861A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006063861 A1 20060622; EP 1838678 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110208

2008-06-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TORRENS JOVER, ANTONI

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUSCHMANN, HELMUT H.

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAHMEN, STEFAN

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RIDDER, MATTHIAS

2007-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TORRENS JOVER, ANTONI

2007-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUSCHMANN, HELMUT H.

2007-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAHMEN, STEFAN

2007-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LORMANN, MATTHIAS

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES