Global Patent Index - EP 1838868 A1

EP 1838868 A1 2007-10-03 - INTERNAL POSITIVE CONTROL FOR PROBE-BASED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE ASSAYS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THEREOF

Title (en)

INTERNAL POSITIVE CONTROL FOR PROBE-BASED NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE ASSAYS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THEREOF

Title (de)

INTERNE POSITIVKONTROLLE FÜR NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLTESTS AUF SONDENBASIS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON

Title (fr)

CONTROLE POSITIF INTERNE POUR DOSAGES DE MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE PAR SONDE ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1838868 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 04821422 A

Priority

US 2004043290 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006068647A1] Disclosed herein are isolated nucleic acid molecules that may be used as an internal positive controls in probe-based nucleic acid assays such as TaqMan® based assays. Also disclosed are probes comprising the isolated nucleic acid molecule of the present invention. The probes may comprise a reporter molecule and a quencher molecule. Also disclosed are assays which comprise using the probe of the present invention. The probes may be used to distinguish false negative results from true negative results in assays for a target nucleic acid molecule. The probe may be used in conjunction with probe-based nucleic acid assays for the detection of an organism such as one belonging to Bacillus, Mycobacterium, Francisella, Brucella, Clostridium, Yersinia,

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/686 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12Q 1/686 + C12Q 2561/101 + C12Q 2545/101

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006068647 A1 20060629; EP 1838868 A1 20071003; EP 1838868 A4 20081015

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120707

2009-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090728

2008-10-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080917

2008-03-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WASIELOSKI, LEONARD,C

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NORWOOD, DAVID A.,C/O USAMRIID

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTMAN, LAURIE J.,C/O USAMRIID

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WASIELOSKI, LEONARD,C/O USAMRIID

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NORWOOD, DAVID A.,C/O USAMRIID

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTMAN, LAURIE J.,C/O USAMRIID

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070717

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR