Global Patent Index - EP 1838888 A2

EP 1838888 A2 2007-10-03 - DUCTILE IRON AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DUCTILE IRON FOR ENGINEERING COMPONENTS REQUIRING STRENGTH AND TOUGHNESS

Title (en)

DUCTILE IRON AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DUCTILE IRON FOR ENGINEERING COMPONENTS REQUIRING STRENGTH AND TOUGHNESS

Title (de)

DUKTILES EISEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DUKTILEM EISEN FÜR TECHNISCHE KOMPONENTEN, DIE FESTIGKEIT UND ZÄHIGKEIT VERLANGEN

Title (fr)

FONTE DUCTILE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE POUR L'ELABORATION DE COMPOSANTS A PROPRIETES DE RESISTANCE ET DE TENACITE DESIREES

Publication

EP 1838888 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06700056 A

Priority

  • FI 2006050002 W
  • FI 20055010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006072663A2] The invention relates to ductile iron for engineering components requiring strength and toughness. This ductile iron is fine grain ductile iron. Fine grain ductile iron (FGDI) comprises as weight percentages: C 3.6-2.8, Si 1.3-2.6, Mg 0.065-0.025, Mn 0.8-0.1 and Cu 0.1-1.6, Ni 0.2-2.0, P 0.03-0.005 and S 0.003-0.01. The graphite sphere density of fine grain ductile iron (FGDI) is 150-400 spheres/mm2. The object of the invention is also a method for manufacturing ductile iron for engineering components requiring strength and toughness. In the method, raw materials are melted with induction melting (21), in the melt-treatment phases, the melt is spheroidised (22), inoculated (23) and cast (24), and after the shake-out phase of castings (25), the secondary operations of castings are performed (26). For manufacturing fine grain ductile iron (FGDI), the pieces are heat-treated in a URVA 850 heat treatment (28).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 37/04 (2006.01); C22C 33/08 (2006.01); C22C 33/10 (2006.01); C22C 37/10 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C21D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 33/10 (2013.01); C22C 33/08 (2013.01); C22C 37/04 (2013.01); C22C 37/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006072663A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006072663 A2 20060713; WO 2006072663 A3 20070518; EP 1838888 A2 20071003; FI 118738 B 20080229; FI 20055010 A0 20050105; FI 20055010 A 20060706

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150801

2014-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: URV UUDENKAUPUNGIN RAUTAVALIMO OY

2014-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALMET TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090403

2008-04-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU