Global Patent Index - EP 1838908 A1

EP 1838908 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MELT-SPINNING AND TEXTURING A PLURALITY OF MULTIFILAMENT THREADS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MELT-SPINNING AND TEXTURING A PLURALITY OF MULTIFILAMENT THREADS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHMELZSPINNEN UND TEXTURIEREN EINER VIELZAHL VON MULTIFILEN FAEDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FILAGE PAR FUSION ET TEXTURATION D'UNE PLURALITE DE FILS MULTIFILAMENTS

Publication

EP 1838908 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05848932 A

Priority

  • EP 2005013556 W
  • DE 102004061655 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006069642A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for melt-spinning and texturing a plurality of threads, and to a method for controlling one such device. The plurality of spinning points is divided into a number of spinning stations and the plurality of texturing points is divided into a number of processing groups. According to the invention, a processing group that can be controlled independently of adjacent spinning stations and processing groups is associated with each spinning station.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D01D 5/00 (2006.01); D01D 5/08 (2006.01); D01D 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 13/02 (2013.01); D01D 5/08 (2013.01); D01D 5/22 (2013.01); D02G 1/02 (2013.01); D02G 1/0206 (2013.01); D02G 1/0266 (2013.01); D02G 1/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006069642A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006069642 A1 20060706; CN 101087908 A 20071212; CN 104233489 A 20141224; EP 1838908 A1 20071003; EP 1838908 B1 20120718; JP 2008524466 A 20080710; JP 4903158 B2 20120328

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151216

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 567059 T

- Effective date: 20151216

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005012925

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-05-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121216

2014-02-28 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20131212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502005012925

- Effective date: 20130419

2013-06-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130419

2012-09-13 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502005012925

- Effective date: 20120913

2012-08-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 567059 T

- Effective date: 20120815

2012-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI TR

2008-12-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081121

2008-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2008-04-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI TR

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070710

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI TR