Global Patent Index - EP 1838930 A1

EP 1838930 A1 2007-10-03 - A concrete product with insulating layer for a building structure

Title (en)

A concrete product with insulating layer for a building structure

Title (de)

Gebäudeteil aus Beton mit einer Isolierschicht

Title (fr)

Produit en beton avec couche isolante pour structure de construction

Publication

EP 1838930 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06700453 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000187 W
  • EP 05075065 A
  • EP 06700453 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1690991A1] The present invention concerns a concrete product (1) for a building structure, wherein at least one steel attachment rail (2) is provided at the exterior surface of the concrete product for attachment of at least one building element to the concrete product by welding. By providing attachment rails on the exterior surface of the concrete product, it becomes possible to attach building elements, such as fire insulation panels (4), anchoring means for ventilation ducts, suspended ceilings and the like, to the concrete elements. In particular, it is found advantageous to attach a fire-retarding insulation layer without penetrating anchoring screws or the like into the concrete floors thereby risking a reduction of the strength of the concrete element, e.g. exposing the steel reinforcement to humidity, providing cracks in the hollow core structure, etc.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01); E04C 2/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4107 (2013.01); E04C 2/526 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006074913A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1690991 A1 20060816; EP 1838930 A1 20071003; WO 2006074913 A1 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-02-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A CONCRETE PRODUCT WITH INSULATING LAYER FOR A BUILDING STRUCTURE

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071019

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR