Global Patent Index - EP 1838940 A1

EP 1838940 A1 2007-10-03 - FLAT KEY

Title (en)

FLAT KEY

Title (de)

FLACHSCHLÜSSEL

Title (fr)

CLÉ PLATE

Publication

EP 1838940 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06706254 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000349 W
  • AT 772005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077066A1] The invention relates to a flat key (1) which is not simple to copy, comprising two key large faces (9) and two key narrow faces (10), each defined by two key edges and provided along at least one key narrow side (10) with several incuts (12), for control of single- or multi-pieced spring-loaded tumbler pins (21, 22) in the lock. A first edge rib (5) is provided which runs along the entire length of the key edge of each key narrow face (10) which has the incuts (12) and a second edge rib, preferably provided with guide grooves (8), is provided on the same key large face (9) as the first edge rib (5) along the other key edge. The first and second edge rib form an edge groove (6) and at least one of the incuts (12) on the key narrow face (10) is deeper than the formed edge groove (6), whereby a breach (7) is formed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/0023 (2013.01); E05B 19/0035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077066A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006077066 A1 20060727; WO 2006077066 A8 20061005; AT 501473 A4 20060915; AT 501473 B1 20060915; AT 501473 B8 20070215; EP 1838940 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVVA SICHERHEITSTECHNOLOGIE GMBH

2010-04-21 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100322

2010-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100218

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070714

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR