Global Patent Index - EP 1838956 A1

EP 1838956 A1 2007-10-03 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1838956 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05850088 A

Priority

  • EP 2005056666 W
  • DE 102005001425 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101099035A] Disclosed is a device for controlling an internal combustion engine in which a control device (100) reads data out of a data carrier and/or writes data into said data carrier and uses the same for controlling purposes. The data carrier is assigned to at least one actuator (200) which contains characteristic data. The data is read out of or written into the data carrier by means of a resonant circuit (300) whose components (150, 250) are disposed in the control device (100) and/or a circuit that is allocated to the actuator (200).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/266 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 41/2435 (2013.01); F02D 41/2467 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006074846A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005001425 A1 20060720; CN 100529371 C 20090819; CN 101099035 A 20080102; DE 502005006630 D1 20090326; EP 1838956 A1 20071003; EP 1838956 B1 20090211; US 2008255747 A1 20081016; WO 2006074846 A1 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502005006630

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091212

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091212

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502005006630 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071106

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT