Global Patent Index - EP 1838957 A1

EP 1838957 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD FOR FIXING A FLEXIBLE DRIVE SHAFT IN A THRUST REVERSER AND A THRUST REVERSER OF THIS TYPE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FIXING A FLEXIBLE DRIVE SHAFT IN A THRUST REVERSER AND A THRUST REVERSER OF THIS TYPE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER FLEXIBLEN ANTRIEBSWELLE AN EINEM SCHUBUMKEHRER UND DERARTIGER SCHUBUMKEHRER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FIXATION D'UN ARBRE DE TRANSMISSION FLEXIBLE DANS UN INVERSEUR DE POUSSEE ET UN TEL INVERSEUR DE POUSSEE

Publication

EP 1838957 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 05826574 A

Priority

  • FR 2005003136 W
  • FR 0500623 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2008041184A1] The embodiments relate to a method for fixing a flexible drive shaft in a front frame of a thrust reverser, this front frame being realized with the aid of two partially open semicircular elements. The method includes a step during which a first end of this shaft is linked to a drive system fixed in an element of the front frame, wherein it includes the steps serving to: position at least one fixing sleeve around the shaft; joining at least on fixing support to the thrust reverser; connecting the second end of the shaft to a drive system fixed in the other element of the front frame; force-inserting each fixing sleeve into a seat provided by the associated fixing support in order to hold the shaft in a predetermined position. The embodiments also relate to a thrust reverser used in aeronautics having a fixing sleeve placed around the drive shaft.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02K 1/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02K 1/763 (2013.01); F05D 2230/60 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2045 (2013.01); Y10T 403/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077290A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2881183 A1 20060728; FR 2881183 B1 20070406; CA 2588578 A1 20060727; CN 101084370 A 20071205; EP 1838957 A1 20071003; RU 2007130231 A 20090227; US 2008041184 A1 20080221; WO 2006077290 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091113

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAPUIS, GAUTIER

2008-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIRABAUD, JOACHIM

2008-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAPUIS, GAUTIER

2008-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIRABAUD, JOACHIM

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAPUIS, GAUTIER

2008-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIRABAUD, JOACHIM

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR