Global Patent Index - EP 1838999 A1

EP 1838999 A1 2007-10-03 - SMOKE DAMPER

Title (en)

SMOKE DAMPER

Title (de)

ENTRAUCHUNGSKLAPPE

Title (fr)

REGULATEUR DE GAZ DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1838999 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05821511 A

Priority

  • FI 2005000545 W
  • FI 20050049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006075045A1] A smoke damper is disclosed comprising a substantially rectangular frame installable in a ventilation air duct, the frame having pivotally mounted thereon at least one rotatable slat (2), the slat(s) being rotatable with the help of a separate mechanism by about 90° between an open position and a closed position, the slat having a first long edge (2') and second long edge (2") as the opposite slat edge relative to the first edge, and the slat further having attached thereto an elastic seal (3) and an intumescent sealant (4), whereby the elastic sealant (4) is attached at least onto the first long edge (2') of the slat so as to extend substantially over the entire length of the slat edge. The invention is implemented by way of attaching the intumescent sealant (4) at least onto the second edge (2") of at least one slat (2) so as to extend substantially over the entire length of the slat edge and that the intumescent sealant (4) is covered by a continuous-section strip (7) capable of moving outward from said long slat edge under the swelling action of the intumescent sealant.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2006.01); A62C 2/12 (2006.01); A62C 2/14 (2006.01); A62C 2/06 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

F24F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2013.01); A62C 2/14 (2013.01); A62C 2/065 (2013.01); F24F 11/33 (2018.01); F24F 13/1406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006075045 A1 20060720; DK 1838999 T3 20180528; EP 1838999 A1 20071003; EP 1838999 A4 20100609; EP 1838999 B1 20180214; FI 120848 B 20100331; FI 20050049 A0 20050117; FI 20050049 A 20060718; NO 20074196 L 20070816; NO 340152 B1 20170313

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-20 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20180214

2018-05-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2018-05-28 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

- Effective date: 20180522

2018-03-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005053499

2018-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 970098 T

- Effective date: 20180315

2018-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-12-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171110

2017-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 11/00 20060101ALI20171019BHEP

2017-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 13/14 20060101AFI20171019BHEP

2017-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 2/14 20060101ALI20171019BHEP

2017-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A62C 2/06 20060101ALI20171019BHEP

2015-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150311

2010-06-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100511

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070706

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR