Global Patent Index - EP 1839107 A1

EP 1839107 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD, SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIA FOR DIRECTING INPUT ASSOCIATED WITH A KEYBOARD-TYPE DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD, SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIA FOR DIRECTING INPUT ASSOCIATED WITH A KEYBOARD-TYPE DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN, SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN ZUM RICHTEN VON MIT EINER EINRICHTUNG DES TASTATURTYPS ASSOZIIERTEN EINGABEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE, SYSTEME, APPAREIL ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT DE DIRIGER UNE ENTREE ASSOCIEE A UN DISPOSITIF DE TYPE CLAVIER

Publication

EP 1839107 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05700263 A

Priority

CA 2005000028 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006074530A1] In one aspect of the present invention a computer-implemented method is provided of processing input key events associated with user input received from a keyboard-type device, wherein the keyboard-type device selected from at least one of a keyboard and a keypad. In this aspect, input key events associated with a first process active within an operating system are received and monitored for a first predefined input key event associated with user selection of a first key of the keyboard-type device for at least a predetermined time period. In response to identifying the first predefined input key event, the input key events are redirected from the first process to a second process. The input key events are monitored for a second predefined input key event associated with further redirection of the input key events. In response to identifying the second predefined input key event, the input key events are redirected to the first process.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/023 (2006.01); G06F 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0238 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006074530 A1 20060720; EP 1839107 A1 20071003; EP 1839107 A4 20090429

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090714

2009-04-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090330

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070716

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR