Global Patent Index - EP 1839213 A1

EP 1839213 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A TEXT-BASED INDEX FROM A VOICE ANNOTATION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERATING A TEXT-BASED INDEX FROM A VOICE ANNOTATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES TEXTBASIERTEN INDEX AUS EINEM SPRACHVERMERK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE GENERATION D'INDEX TEXTUEL A PARTIR D'UNE ANNOTATION VOCALE

Publication

EP 1839213 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06704145 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050193 W
  • FR 0500547 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077196A1] The invention relates to a method for generating a text-based index (16) associated with images from a voice annotation (15). The inventive method consists in carrying out a speech recognition (25) applied to the voice annotation (15) with a predetermined recognisable vocabulary (17) in such a way that it makes it possible to search at least one word contained in the recognisable vocabulary (17) in the voice annotation, wherein said word or words identified during the search form the text-based index (16). Said method also comprises a step for defining the recognisable vocabulary consisting in defining (22) a context and in searching (24) a list of words associated with the context in a language system and in forming the recognisable vocabulary (17).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077196A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006077196 A1 20060727; EP 1839213 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160802

2013-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORANGE

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100415

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070626

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR