Global Patent Index - EP 1839258 A1

EP 1839258 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PRODUCING, OFFERING AND EXECUTING RECREATIONAL APPLICATION PROGRAMS

Title (en)

METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PRODUCING, OFFERING AND EXECUTING RECREATIONAL APPLICATION PROGRAMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUM PRODUZIEREN, ANBIETEN UND AUSFÜHREN VON FREIZEIT-ANWENDUNGSPROGRAMMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE, SYSTEME ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR SERVANT A PRODUIRE, PRESENTER ET EXECUTER DES PROGRAMMES D'APPLICATION RECREATIFS

Publication

EP 1839258 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05817479 A

Priority

  • FI 2005000518 W
  • FI 20041563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006058957A1] Recreational application programs are offered for execution through players' terminals. Said recreational application programs involve at least one of playing and gambling. The system comprises an event model (301), which is a process adapted to represent a sequence of subevents in a target event (202, 203, 204) in real time. The system is adapted to offer the execution of a recreational application program through players' terminals as a response to an incident taking place in said event model (301).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/00 (2006.01); A63F 13/10 (2006.01); A63F 13/12 (2006.01); G06F 15/18 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G06F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 50/34 (2013.01); A63F 13/10 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); A63F 2300/6018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006058957 A1 20060608; EP 1839258 A1 20071003; EP 1839258 A4 20090701; FI 119858 B 20090415; FI 20041563 A0 20041202; NO 20072760 A 20070831; US 2008214303 A1 20080904

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140211

2009-07-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090604

2008-03-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVANT GAMES OY LTD

2007-11-07 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20070605

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070605

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR