Global Patent Index - EP 1839265 A1

EP 1839265 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD OF ENCODING AND DECODING TEXTURE COORDINATES IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL MESH INFORMATION FOR EFFECTIVE TEXTURE MAPPING

Title (en)

METHOD OF ENCODING AND DECODING TEXTURE COORDINATES IN THREE-DIMENSIONAL MESH INFORMATION FOR EFFECTIVE TEXTURE MAPPING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG VON TEXTURKOORDINATEN IN DREIDIMENSIONALER GITTERINFORMATION FÜR EFFEKTIVES TEXTURE-MAPPING

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE DE COORDONNEES DE TEXTURE EN INFORMATION MAILLEE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE POUR MAPPAGE DE TEXTURE EFFICACE

Publication

EP 1839265 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06702915 A

Priority

  • KR 2006000151 W
  • KR 20050003832 A
  • KR 20050102222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006075895A1] Provided is a method of encoding and decoding texture coordinates of 3D mesh information. The method of encoding texture coordinates in 3D mesh information includes the steps of: setting an adaptive quantization step size used for quantizing the texture coordinates; quantizing the texture coordinates using the adaptive quantization step size; and encoding the quantized texture coordinates.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/001 (2013.01); H04N 19/124 (2014.11); H04N 19/136 (2014.11); H04N 19/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006075895 A1 20060720; EP 1839265 A1 20071003; EP 1839265 A4 20121017

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131002

2013-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130521

2012-10-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120913

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06T 9/00 20060101AFI20120907BHEP

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 7/26 20060101ALI20120907BHEP

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR