Global Patent Index - EP 1839276 A1

EP 1839276 A1 2007-10-03 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REGISTERING THE OPENING OF LOCKS OF AREAS TO BE SECURED

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REGISTERING THE OPENING OF LOCKS OF AREAS TO BE SECURED

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGISTRIERUNG DES ÖFFNENS VON VERSCHLÜSSEN VON ZU SICHERNDEN RÄUMEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR ENREGISTRER L'OUVERTURE DE VERROUS D'ESPACES A SECURISER

Publication

EP 1839276 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05825190 A

Priority

  • EP 2005057180 W
  • DE 102005001582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006074861A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for registering the opening of locks of areas that are to be secured. According to the invention, a sealing module, which comprises a sensor, a microprocessor, a memory and a device for wireless communication, can be attached to the lock in such a way that the sensor recognises a displacement and writes data documenting said displacement to the memory. A recording device also comprises at least one unit for wireless communication, a microprocessor and a memory, which are configured to read at least the data documenting the displacement from the memory of the sealing module and to write said data to the memory of the mobile recording device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 39/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 39/00 (2013.01); G07C 9/00103 (2013.01); G09F 3/0335 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006074861A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006074861 A1 20060720; DE 102005001582 A1 20060727; EP 1839276 A1 20071003; EP 1839276 B1 20151007; US 2008191870 A1 20080814; US 8149118 B2 20120403

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160107

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160107

2016-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160708

2016-07-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502005014956

2015-11-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502005014956

2015-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2015-10-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-06-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150521

2015-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NIESEN, KLAUS

2015-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KALWEIT, HUBERT

2015-06-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 3/03 20060101ALI20150429BHEP

2015-06-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 39/00 20060101AFI20150429BHEP

2015-06-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 47/00 20060101ALI20150429BHEP

2015-06-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07C 9/00 20060101ALI20150429BHEP

2015-04-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502005014956

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G07C0009000000

- IPC: E05B0039000000

2011-04-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2011-01-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REGISTERING THE OPENING OF LOCKS OF AREAS TO BE SECURED

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071105

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR