Global Patent Index - EP 1839277 A1

EP 1839277 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD FOR CHECKING THE AUTHENTICITY OF GOODS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CHECKING THE AUTHENTICITY OF GOODS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR AUTHENTIZITÄTSPRÜFUNG VON WAREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONTROLE D'IDENTITE DE MARCHANDISES

Publication

EP 1839277 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05850046 A

Priority

  • EP 2005013445 W
  • DE 102004060315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101099177A] The invention relates to a method for checking the authenticity of goods, comprising marking and identifying the goods. According to the inventive method, (i) a mark is applied to the surface of an article in the form of a pattern with a pattern function M(x, y) in a marking step, said mark creating a local modification of the physically measurable properties of the surface of the article in the area of the mark which cannot be perceived by the eye; (ii) the transmission, reflection, or scattering of analytical radiation by the surface of the article is detected in accordance with the location coordinates (x, y) and the wavelength of the analytical radiation, a response function A(x, y, ) that reflects the intensity of the transmitted, reflected, or scattered analytical radiation is determined in accordance with the local coordinates (x, y) and the wavelength , and the correlation of the response function A(x, y, ) with the previously known pattern function M(x, y) is determined by means of a correlation analysis in an identification step, the mark being detected using the correlation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/004 (2013.01); G07D 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006063817A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102004060315 A1 20060622; CN 101099177 A 20080102; CN 101099177 B 20100908; EP 1839277 A1 20071003; US 2009266875 A1 20091029; WO 2006063817 A1 20060622

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20101127

2008-03-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070716

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR