Global Patent Index - EP 1839378 A2

EP 1839378 A2 2007-10-03 - METHOD AND TOPOLOGY TO SWITCH AN OUTPUT STAGE IN A CLASS AB AUDIO AMPLIFIER FOR WIRELESS APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND TOPOLOGY TO SWITCH AN OUTPUT STAGE IN A CLASS AB AUDIO AMPLIFIER FOR WIRELESS APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND TOPOLOGIE ZUM SCHALTEN EINER AUSGANGSSTUFE IN EINEM KLASSE-AB-AUDIOVERSTÄRKER FÜR DRAHTLOSE ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET TOPOLOGIE PERMETTANT DE COMMUTER UN ETAGE DE SORTIE DANS UN AMPLIFICATEUR AUDIO DE CLASSE AB DESTINES A DES APPLICATIONS SANS FIL

Publication

EP 1839378 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05854097 A

Priority

  • US 2005045312 W
  • FR 0500506 A
  • US 10941005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006078378A2] A circuit (100) and method of switching an output of a single preamplifier (110) to or from multiple amplifier output stages (150, 151). The preamplifier output is switched between multiple audio amplifier output stages without degrading the performance of the output signal. A switching circuit (210-213, 220-223) selectively couples the preamplifier output to an amplifier output stage and also couples (160, 161) a feedback loop (122, 123) between the selected amplifier output stage and the preamplifier stage.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02B 1/00 (2006.01); H03F 99/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03F 3/68 (2013.01); H03F 3/181 (2013.01); H03F 3/45475 (2013.01); H03F 3/72 (2013.01); H03F 2200/03 (2013.01); H03F 2203/45534 (2013.01); H03F 2203/7215 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006078378 A2 20060727; WO 2006078378 A3 20061116; EP 1839378 A2 20071003; EP 1839378 A4 20090114

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATMEL ROUSSET S.A.S.

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090318

2009-01-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081211

2008-04-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUILBERT, PASCAL

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070810

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB