Global Patent Index - EP 1839459 A1

EP 1839459 A1 2007-10-03 - METHOD BY WHICH ONE OF THE LISTENERS PARTICIPATING IN A GROUP CALL CAN INTERRUPT A SPEAKER

Title (en)

METHOD BY WHICH ONE OF THE LISTENERS PARTICIPATING IN A GROUP CALL CAN INTERRUPT A SPEAKER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN, MIT DEM EINER DER AN EINEM GRUPPENANRUF TEILNEHMENDEN ZUHÖRER EINEN SPRECHER UNTERBRECHEN KANN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INTERRUPTION DU LOCUTEUR DU MOMENT D'UN APPEL DE GROUPE PAR UN DES AUDITEURS DUDIT APPEL DE GROUPE

Publication

EP 1839459 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06709094 A

Priority

  • FR 2006000087 W
  • FR 0500336 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006075105A1] The invention relates to a method by which one of the listeners participating in a group call can interrupt a speaker, said group call taking place in a mobile telephone network that allows group calls. The inventive method is characterised in that it comprises the following steps, namely: a) a step in which the mobile station of the requesting listener accesses a dedicated signalling channel in order to transmit an interruption request to the network, b) a step in which the network processes the request in order to decide whether or not to interrupt the speaker, and c) a step in which the speaker is interrupted when the network has decided to do so.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/10 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/10 (2013.01); H04W 76/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006075105A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2880761 A1 20060714; FR 2880761 B1 20070427; EP 1839459 A1 20071003; WO 2006075105 A1 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160802

2011-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM ENERGY & TELECOM SAS

2010-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM ENERGY & TELECOM

2009-11-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS SAS

2009-09-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS

2009-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS SAS

2009-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS

2008-04-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT