Global Patent Index - EP 1839518 A1

EP 1839518 A1 2007-10-03 - Foldable umbrella frame

Title (en)

Foldable umbrella frame

Title (de)

Zusammenklappbarer Regenschirmrahmen

Title (fr)

Structure de parapluie pliable

Publication

EP 1839518 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06251780 A

Priority

EP 06251780 A

Abstract (en)

A foldable umbrella frame includes a plurality of ribs (3) eachhaving a foldable portion that includes twopivoted segments (331,332) which extend along a centerline to terminate at two grip ends (333,334), and a reinforcing member (5) which has two gripped ends (515,516,525,526) firmly gripped in the grip ends (333,334) by virtue of malleating the grip ends (333,334), and an intermediate portion (517,527) that extends along the centerline and that has first and second surfaces (513,523,511,521) opposite to each other in the upright direction. The first surface (513,523) has a ridge region (514,524) which extends in the upright direction and along the centerline and which is formed by pressing the second surface (511,521) towards the first surface (513,523) and along the centerline so as to strengthen the structure of the ribs (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/02 (2013.01); A45B 19/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839518 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080819

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080404

2008-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080218

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU