Global Patent Index - EP 1839538 A2

EP 1839538 A2 2007-10-03 - Check-out counter with display device

Title (en)

Check-out counter with display device

Title (de)

Kassenstand mit Displayeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Comptoir d'enregistrement avec dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1839538 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 06013059 A

Priority

DE 102006012690 A

Abstract (en)

The stand has a frame with an endless, progressive clear-transparent conveyer band (19), and a support unit arranged in the frame and provided for the band. The unit divides the band into processing and return strands. The horizontally running processing strand transports goods to the stand. A display device (21, 22) is arranged under the band to display images or text contents. The device is viewable by customers through the band.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kassenstand (1) in einem Selbstbedienungsgeschäft weist ein Förderband (19) aus einem klar durchsichtigen Bahnmaterial auf. Unterhalb des Arbeitstrums (31) des Förderbands befindet sich eine oder mehrere Displayeinrichtungen (21,22), mit deren Hilfe Bilder oder Texte dargestellt und wiedergegeben werden können, die durch das Arbeitstrum des Förderbandes hindurch sichtbar sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839538 A2 20071003; EP 1839538 A3 20071205; DE 102006012690 A1 20070920

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091218

2008-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080513

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080409

2007-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU