Global Patent Index - EP 1839621 A1

EP 1839621 A1 2007-10-03 - Method and system to determine a physiological state of a sow

Title (en)

Method and system to determine a physiological state of a sow

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Bestimmung des physiologischen Zustands einer Sau

Title (fr)

Méthode et système pour déterminer l'état physiologique d'une truie

Publication

EP 1839621 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06006972 A

Priority

EP 06006972 A

Abstract (en)

Method for determining a physiological state of a sow, comprising the steps of non-invasively surveying a current state of activity of said sow during at least one discrete time slice of a current day; comparing the state of activity with stored data relating to at least one corresponding time slice of at least one day preceding the current day; and determining on the base of said comparison the physiological state of said sow. The surveyed state of activity includes the time period during which the sow is standing and the time period during which the sow is laying down.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61D 17/002 (2013.01); A61D 17/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839621 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100126

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080403

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU