Global Patent Index - EP 1839759 A2

EP 1839759 A2 2007-10-03 - Method and device for powder coating of a metal coil

Title (en)

Method and device for powder coating of a metal coil

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Pulverbeschichten eines Metallbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif destinés au revêtement électrostatique par pulvérisation d'une bobine de métal

Publication

EP 1839759 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07003461 A

Priority

DE 102006014397 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves dosing lacquer (P) applied on a metal band in a paint dosing system (2) according to a desired quantity of lacquer per time. The dosed lacquer is fed from the lacquer dosing system to an air jet system (3). The lacquer is applied from the air jet system to a metal band, where the air flow is adjusted independent of the quantity of the lacquer per time and is guided for application of the lacquer by the air jet system. An independent claim is also included for a device for coating powder lacquer on a metal band, comprising a powder dosing system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Pulverbeschichten eines Metallbandes (1). Um eine verbesserte Pulverbeschichtung, insbesondere im Falle der Aufbringung von Pulverlack, zu erreichen, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, dass das auf das Metallband (1) aufzubringende Pulver in einem Pulverdosiersystem (2) gemäß einer gewünschten Auftragsmenge Pulver pro Zeit dosiert wird und dass das von dem Pulverdosiersystem (2) dosierte Pulver zu einem Luftdüsensystem (3) gefördert und von diesem auf das Metallband (1) aufgebracht wird, wobei der zur Auftragung des Pulvers durch das Luftdüsensystem durchgeleitete Luftstrom unabhängig von der Auftragsmenge des Pulvers pro Zeit gewählt bzw. eingestellt wird. Des weiteren betrifft die Erfindung eine Vorrichtung zum Pulverbeschichten eines Metallbandes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/03 (2006.01); B05B 5/14 (2006.01); B05B 5/16 (2006.01); B05B 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/14 (2013.01); B05B 5/032 (2013.01); B05C 9/04 (2013.01); B05D 1/06 (2013.01); B05D 2202/00 (2013.01); B05D 2252/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839759 A2 20071003; EP 1839759 A3 20081105; DE 102006014397 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-07-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SIEMAG AG

2008-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU