Global Patent Index - EP 1839762 A1

EP 1839762 A1 2007-10-03 - Optimised method of spraying a liquid and liquid-spraying device for implementing this method

Title (en)

Optimised method of spraying a liquid and liquid-spraying device for implementing this method

Title (de)

Optimiertes Sprühverfahren für Flüssigkeiten und Vorrichtung zum Sprühen von Flüssigkeiten für die Umsetzung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé optimisé de pulvérisation de liquide et dispositif de pulvérisation de liquide pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1839762 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07105021 A

Priority

FR 0602687 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves momentarily interrupting ultrasound transmitters during an interruption period, in which a liquid contained in a nozzle falls in a bowl, after the liquid level reaches a preset lower level. A new spraying step is performed if the liquid level in the bowl is higher than the preset lower level at the end of the interruption period. Another liquid e.g. water, is provided in the bowl and is sprayed till humidity rate of an environment reaches a predetermined value. An independent claim is also included for a device for spraying a liquid.

Abstract (fr)

Ce procédé de pulvérisation est mis en oeuvre à l'aide d'un dispositif (10) de pulvérisation de liquide comportant une cuve ouverte à sa partie supérieure, apte à contenir un liquide à pulvériser, et un diffuseur (12) de liquide pulvérisé agencé dans la cuve. Le diffuseur (12) comprend une buse contenant du liquide provenant de la cuve, et un émetteur à ultrasons apte à émettre des ondes ultrasonores dans ce liquide de façon à le pulvériser. Le procédé comporte une étape de pulvérisation du liquide, réalisée jusqu'à ce que le niveau du liquide dans la cuve soit sensiblement égal à un niveau minimum prédéterminé. Le procédé comporte en outre une étape d'interruption momentanée de l'émetteur à ultrasons pendant une durée d'interruption, réalisée au terme de l'étape de pulvérisation, au cours de laquelle le liquide contenu dans la buse retombe dans la cuve, et une nouvelle étape de pulvérisation, réalisée tant que, au terme de la durée d'interruption, le niveau du liquide dans la cuve est supérieur au niveau minimum prédéterminé.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 17/0607 (2013.01); B05B 15/652 (2018.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839762 A1 20071003; FR 2899135 A1 20071005; FR 2899135 B1 20080620; US 2008011873 A1 20080117

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080502

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080327

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU