Global Patent Index - EP 1839814 A2

EP 1839814 A2 2007-10-03 - Pressing tool, press ring and crimping pliers

Title (en)

Pressing tool, press ring and crimping pliers

Title (de)

Presswerkzeug, Pressring und Presszange

Title (fr)

Outil de compression, bague de compression et pince de sertissage

Publication

EP 1839814 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07104101 A

Priority

DE 202006004876 U

Abstract (en)

Claimed is a press tool (1), a press ring (2) with two converging (6) press levers (5), and press tongs (3) with two jaws (8). Application of the jaws (3) on the ring (2) is via two sets of contacting interfaces (9). Each interface consists of a flat surface and a curved surface (10).

Abstract (de)

Ein Presswerkzeug (1) zum verpressenden Verbinden von Werkstücken mit einem Pressring (2), der mindestens zwei gelenkig verbundene Presselemente (5) und eine Schließstelle (6) umfasst, und einer Presszange (3), die zumindest zwei Pressbacken (8) umfasst, wobei der Eingriff der Presszange (3) am Pressring (2) über zwei Eingriffsflächen-Paare erfolgt und die beiden Eingriffsflächen eines Eingriffsflächen-Paares im Eingriff in Kontakt sind, weist für beide Eingriffsflächen-Paare je eine ebene Eingriffsfläche (9) und eine gekrümmte Eingriffsfläche (10) auf.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006004876 U1 20070802; EP 1839814 A2 20071003; EP 1839814 A3 20080820

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090221

2009-06-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-04-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU