Global Patent Index - EP 1839821 A2

EP 1839821 A2 2007-10-03 - Razor assembly

Title (en)

Razor assembly

Title (de)

Rasiereranordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble rasoir

Publication

EP 1839821 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07103906 A

Priority

  • EP 03747177 A
  • US 37584402 P
  • US 40518502 P

Abstract (en)

A razor assembly is provided that includes a razor cartridge (12) with one or more razor blades, a shaving aid body (14), a handle (16), and a linkage (18) pivotally connected to the handle (16). The linkage (18) is connected to the razor cartridge (12) and the shaving aid body (14) in a manner such that the razor cartridge (12) and the shaving aid body (14) are moveable relative to the handle (16). Movement of one of the razor cartridge (12) or the shaving aid body (14) in a first direction causes the other of the razor cartridge (12) or the shaving aid body (14) to move in a second direction substantially opposite the first direction. As a result, the positions of the shaving aid body (14) and the razor cartridge (12) are continuously adjusted to maintain the contact surface of the shaving aid body approximately co-planar with the cutting edges of the razor blades within the razor cartridge.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/14 (2006.01); B26B 21/44 (2006.01); B26B 21/22 (2006.01); B26B 21/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/222 (2013.01); B26B 21/4037 (2013.01); B26B 21/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839821 A2 20071003; EP 1839821 A3 20071010; EP 1839821 B1 20100512

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-01 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60332563

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110215

2010-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60332563 P 20100624

2010-05-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1501661 P

2010-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOLLO, BRIAN, ANTHONY

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PENNELLA, ANDREW, JOSPEH

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CICCONE, CHRISTINE, MARIE

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOLLO, BRIAN, ANTHONY

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOTTA, VINCENT, COSMO

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PENNELLA, ANDREW, JOSPEH

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SASUTA, MICHAEL, JOHN

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080404

2008-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080227

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1501661 P

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR