Global Patent Index - EP 1839845 A1

EP 1839845 A1 2007-10-03 - A method of producing overwrap material, and a pack furnished with the material produced

Title (en)

A method of producing overwrap material, and a pack furnished with the material produced

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Verpackungsmaterial und mit diesem Material versehene Packung

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'un matériel de suremballage, et paquet fourni avec le matériau produit

Publication

EP 1839845 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07104905 A

Priority

IT BO20060214 A

Abstract (en)

Transparent outer wrappers for cigarette packets are prepared by advancing a continuous strip of overwrap material (1) along a given feed path (P) in a given direction (A), piercing a predetermined area (2) of the strip with a series of slits (4) spaced apart one from another and extending nominally transverse to the feed direction (A), and bonding a narrow ribbon (7) to the strip (1) along the predetermined area (2), aligned on at least one portion (4a) of the slits (4); the strip then passes under a blade (12) shaped so as to cut a series of "U" notches (10) spaced apart one from the next, each creating a pull tab (11) at the end of the ribbon (7), before being divided ultimately into leaves (13) by a pair of contrarotating cutter rollers (14) equipped with respective blades (14a). Each single leaf (13) serves as a wrapper (16) for a relative pack, fashioned so that when torn open by pulling the ribbon (7), the ribbon encounters the slit (4) and initiates two break lines (17) extending away from the ribbon (7) on either side to facilitate the removal of the wrapper (16) in its entirety.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/90 (2006.01); B65D 75/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/66 (2013.01); B65D 85/1027 (2013.01); B31B 50/16 (2017.08); B31B 50/8126 (2017.08); B31B 70/146 (2017.08); B31B 70/16 (2017.08); B31B 70/8123 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839845 A1 20071003; EP 1839845 A8 20071219; EP 1839845 B1 20091028; EP 1839845 B2 20141203; CN 101045344 A 20071003; DE 602007002937 D1 20091210; IT BO20060214 A1 20060628; JP 2007261689 A 20071011; JP 5242930 B2 20130724; US 2007228040 A1 20071004

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602007002937

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0001900000

- IPC: B31B0050810000

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-08 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602007002937

- Effective date: 20141203

2014-12-15 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2014-12-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20141203

2014-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI TR

2014-12-03 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602007002937

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2014-04-30 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B31B 1/16 20060101ALI20140324BHEP

2014-04-30 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 85/10 20060101ALI20140324BHEP

2014-04-30 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B31B 1/14 20060101ALI20140324BHEP

2014-04-30 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B31B 1/90 20060101AFI20140324BHEP

2014-04-30 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 75/66 20060101ALI20140324BHEP

2013-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110326

2010-07-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Effective date: 20100607

2010-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20100308

- Year of fee payment: 4

2009-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2009-12-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007002937 P 20091210

2009-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI TR

2009-10-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BORIANI, SILVANO

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NEGRINI, STEFANO

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI TR

2008-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080121

2007-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071109

2007-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: G.D S.P.A.

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU