Global Patent Index - EP 1839862 A2

EP 1839862 A2 2007-10-03 - Method for controlling a printing press

Title (en)

Method for controlling a printing press

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'une presse

Publication

EP 1839862 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07005772 A

Priority

DE 102006015277 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves obtaining data and parameters for a printing machine control and/or for a radiator control of a radiation source and/or for a control of a marking device in a printing machine, from an obtained measured data. Data in a closed control loop is allowed to serve for adjusting the radiation output of the radiation source. A polymerization degree of printed color-or varnish pile is measured directly on a printing substrate and on the basis of measured data or characteristics control and regulation of the machine. An independent claim is also included for a printing quality control system for a printing machine.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt ein Verfahren zur Steuerung von Maschinenleistung, von Strahlerleistung und gegebenenfalls einer Markierungseinrichtung einer Druckmaschine zur Verarbeitung von durch Strahlung härtenden Druckfarben und Lacken. Der Polymerisationsgrad der Druckfarben und / oder Lacke wird dabei "inline" während des Drucklaufs oder "offline", außerhalb der Druckmaschine, bestimmt und aus der Messung Kenngrößen für die Steuerung der Strahlerleistung, der Maschinenleistung und / oder für die Ansteuerung von Markierungseinrichtungen abgeleitet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/0409 (2013.01); B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839862 A2 20071003; EP 1839862 A3 20110803; DE 102006015277 A1 20071018; JP 2007276468 A 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140311

2013-11-27 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20140203

2012-03-21 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120203

2011-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-08-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2011-08-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 23/04 20060101AFI20110630BHEP

2011-08-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 33/00 20060101ALI20110630BHEP

2008-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU