Global Patent Index - EP 1839872 A1

EP 1839872 A1 2007-10-03 - Ink cartridge

Title (en)

Ink cartridge

Title (de)

Tintenpatrone

Title (fr)

Cartouche d'encre

Publication

EP 1839872 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06019206 A

Priority

JP 2006099835 A

Abstract (en)

An ink cartridge (1) is provided which allows fabrication by means of resin metal mold molding using a metal mold of simple structure. An ink tank (60) which stores ink, and which also supports a sensor arm (70) in its interior in a manner allowing rocking according to the amount of ink remaining, is formed by a bottomed, box-shaped body (10) possessing a main opening (11) and by a lid (50) which covers the main opening (11) of the body (10), each of which is formed from a resin material. An ink supply path (20) and an air-communicating path (30) communicating with the ink tank (60) are provided on a wall confronting a main opening (11) of the body (10). On the lid (50) there is also provided a supporting flange (51) which projects toward the interior of the ink tank (60) and supports the sensor arm (70) in a manner allowing rocking.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17566 (2013.01); B41J 2002/17573 (2013.01); B41J 2002/17576 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839872 A1 20071003; EP 1839872 B1 20101117; CN 100575093 C 20091230; CN 101015993 A 20070815; DE 602006018257 D1 20101230; JP 2007268948 A 20071018; JP 4961802 B2 20120627

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602006018257

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110818

2010-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006018257 P 20101230

2010-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU