Global Patent Index - EP 1839874 A1

EP 1839874 A1 2007-10-03 - System for servicing cartridges of inkjet printers

Title (en)

System for servicing cartridges of inkjet printers

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Wartung von Patronen für Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Système d'entretien des cartouches pour imprimante à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1839874 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06112039 A

Priority

EP 06112039 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement (1) has container (18) for holding the cartridge in a fixed position. A seal element (45) at the container has a passage (47) for a liquid or gaseous fluid. The seal element in the fixing position lies against the injector plate that a fluid stream produced flows through only a part of the nozzle rows in the passage. An independent claim is also included for a method for filling a cartridge of a ink jet printer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung zur Wartung einer Patrone für einen Tintenstrahldrucker, insbesondere zur Befüllung oder Reinigung einer solchen Patrone, wobei die Patrone einen Druckkopf mit einer Düsenplatte aufweist, auf welcher eine Mehrzahl von wenigstens zwei Düsenreihen angeordnet ist, mit einem Halter (18) zum Halten der Patrone in einer Fixierposition und einem an dem Halter (18) festgelegten oder festlegbaren Dichtungselement (45), welches wenigstens einen Durchlass (47) für ein flüssiges oder gasförmiges Fluid aufweist, wobei das Dichtungselement (45) in der Fixierposition derart an der Düsenplatte anliegt, dass eine in dem Durchlass (47) erzeugte Fluidströmung nur einen Teil der Düsenreihen durchströmt. Die Erfindung betrifft auch ein Verfahren zur Befüllung einer Patrone.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17506 (2013.01); B41J 2/16505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839874 A1 20071003; EP 1839874 B1 20081231; DE 502006002486 D1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-12-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002486 P 20090212

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2008-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOWA BOSSE + WAGNER OHG

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070730

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU