Global Patent Index - EP 1839900 A3

EP 1839900 A3 2007-10-10 - Fastening system for a ring binder mechanism

Title (en)

Fastening system for a ring binder mechanism

Title (de)

Befestigungssystem für einen Ringordnermechanismus

Title (fr)

Système d'attache pour un mécanisme de reliure à anneaux

Publication

EP 1839900 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07104829 A

Priority

  • US 38850606 A
  • US 67549407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1839900A2] A fastening system includes a tubular mounting post (27) engageable with a first structural member (3). The mounting post has an opened first end (27a), a second end (27b), and a sidewall extending therebetween and defining an interior channel. A retainer (53) is held within the interior channel against movement relative thereto and has a central opening sized smaller than the interior channel of the mounting post at the first end of the mounting post. A fastener (55) is engageable with a second structural member (5) and has a shaft (67) sized in cross-section smaller than the interior channel of the mounting post (27) at least at the first end thereof and larger than the central opening of the retainer such that upon insertion of the shaft into the central opening of the retainer the retainer fastenably secures the fastener to the mounting post to thereby fasten the second structural member to the first structural member.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/0066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839900 A2 20071003; EP 1839900 A3 20071010; CA 2583045 A1 20070924; JP 2007253624 A 20071004; KR 20070096945 A 20071002; MX 2007003625 A 20081127; RU 2007110801 A 20080927; TW 200800641 A 20080101

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080411

2008-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU