Global Patent Index - EP 1840025 A2

EP 1840025 A2 2007-10-03 - Electrical traction system

Title (en)

Electrical traction system

Title (de)

Elektrisches Antriebssystem

Title (fr)

Système de traction électrique

Publication

EP 1840025 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07105268 A

Priority

IT MI20060632 A

Abstract (en)

Electrical traction system having a propeller group formed from an inner hollow cylinder (21) inside which at least one propeller (22) is fixedly connected coaxial to said cylinder, so that the propeller itself and the cylinder can rotate together around said axis. The system comprises a rotor of an electric motor inside which such an inner cylinder is coaxially arranged and a cylindrical stator (63) is fitted onto said rotor, in such a way making an electric motor in which the rotor is hollow and cylindrical and a propeller is arranged inside it that rotates with said rotor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/16 (2006.01); B63H 21/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 1/16 (2013.01); B63H 21/17 (2013.01); B63H 3/00 (2013.01); B63H 2001/165 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840025 A2 20071003; EP 1840025 A3 20140604; IT MI20060632 A1 20071001

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160729

2015-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2015-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2015-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2015-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2015-02-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: HR

2015-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 1/16 20060101AFI20140428BHEP

2014-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63H 21/17 20060101ALI20140428BHEP

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU