Global Patent Index - EP 1840079 A1

EP 1840079 A1 2007-10-03 - Container for storing liquids

Title (en)

Container for storing liquids

Title (de)

Behälter zur Lagerung von Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Récipient de stockage de liquides

Publication

EP 1840079 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07004475 A

Priority

EP 06004426 A

Abstract (en)

Container (3) comprises an elastically deformable bag (42) filled with a liquid (2) being stored and an adapter (44) connected to the bag forming an outlet opening (43) for the liquid. An opening (45) passes through the adapter into an outer wall (41) of the container. A protective collar (46) is fixed to the adapter and is arranged between the bag and the outer wall of the container. The collar covers the opening (45) from inside. Preferred Features: The adapter is connected to a line (4) for the liquid. The liquid stored in the container is driven out using gravity and/or a pump (5) in the line.

Abstract (de)

Ein Behälter (3') zur Lagerung von Flüssigkeiten (2), insbesondere von Bieren, Wässern oder dgl., mit einer festen Außenwand (41), soll eine einfache und kostengünstige Handhabung gewährleisten, ohne dass dabei die Qualität des Flüsslgkeits-Lebensmittels beeinträchtigt wird. Darüber hinaus sollen die kostenintensiven Reinigungsarbeiten zur Erfüllung der Hygienebestimmung bei der Wiederverwendung von herkömmlichen Keg-Fässem vermieden werden. Ferner soll die Handhabung des erfindungsgemäßen Behälters einfach sein und der in dem Behälter eingesetzte Beutel soll Im Bereich der Ausgußöffnung gegen Beschädigungen geschützt sein. Diese Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, dass in dem Behälter (3') ein elastisch verformbarer Beutel (42) eingesetzt ist, in dem die Flüssigkeit (2) einfüllbar ist, dass mit dem Beutel (42) ein eine Ausgussöffnung (43) bildender Adapter (44) verbunden ist, durch den die Flüssigkeit (2) in und/oder aus dem Beutel (42) ein- bzw. ausbringbar ist, dass der Adapter (44) eine in die Außenwand (41) des Behälters (3) eingearbeitete Öffnung (45) durchgreift und dass an dem Adapter (44) eine Stützmanschette (46) befestigt ist, die zwischen dem Beutel (42) und der Außenwand (41) des Behälters (3) angeordnet ist und durch die die Öffnung (45) von innen abdeckbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/00 (2006.01); B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B67D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0462 (2013.01); B65D 65/403 (2013.01); B65D 77/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1829817 A1 20070905; EP 1840079 A1 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080508

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU