Global Patent Index - EP 1840230 A2

EP 1840230 A2 2007-10-03 - One-piece calibration method for crankcase tempering, device for implementing the method

Title (en)

One-piece calibration method for crankcase tempering, device for implementing the method

Title (de)

Monoblock-Kalibrierungsverfahren zur Härtung eines Gehäuses, Vorrichtung zur Umsetzung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de calibrage monobloc pour trempe de carter, dispositif de mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 1840230 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07290364 A

Priority

FR 0651039 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves arranging a cylindrical part (1) of an aeronautic turbomachine case e.g. compressor casing, in a pot heater (5), and heating the cylindrical part to a hot thermal processing temperature. An inner sizing die (8) is installed inside the cylindrical part during its maximum structural recess, where the sizing die has a diameter higher than a diameter of the cylindrical part. The cylindrical part is cooled to a temperature lower than an ambient temperature of a maximum structural recess. The inner sizing die is extracted. An independent claim is also included for a cylindrical part sizing device comprising a model.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention porte sur un procédé de calibrage d'une pièce cylindrique (1) après mise en forme par déformation plastique d'un matériau métallique présentant un retrait structural maximum à une température de retrait maximum comprise entre une première température et une deuxième température inférieure à la première, caractérisé par le fait qu'il comprend les étapes successives suivantes : - mise en place de la pièce (1) dans un four vertical, - positionnement d'un outillage de calibrage interne de diamètre supérieur à celui de la pièce lors de son retrait structural maximum, au droit de la pièce en dehors du four, - chauffage de la pièce (1) jusqu'à une première température, - descent et mise en place, à l'intérieur de la pièce, d'un outil de calibrage (8) interne de diamètre supérieur à celui du retrait structural maximum de la pièce, - transport de l'ensemble formé par la pièce et l'outil de calibrage jusqu'à une cuve de trempe - refroidissement de la pièce jusqu'à une température inférieure à ladite deuxième température, - extraction de l'outil de calibrage interne (8). Le procédé s'applique à la fabrication de carters de turbomachine.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/673 (2006.01); B21C 37/30 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840230 A2 20071003; EP 1840230 A3 20091125; EP 1840230 B1 20120613; CA 2582391 A1 20070927; CA 2582391 C 20140617; CN 101045245 A 20071003; CN 101045245 B 20130109; FR 2898822 A1 20070928; FR 2898822 B1 20090116; IL 182193 A 20120329; IL 182193 D0 20070724; JP 2007262578 A 20071011; JP 5350596 B2 20131127; RU 2007110983 A 20081010; RU 2434702 C2 20111127; US 2007221299 A1 20070927; US 2010019423 A1 20100128; US 7718017 B2 20100518; US 8206644 B2 20120626

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007023309

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130314

2012-08-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007023309

- Effective date: 20120809

2012-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2012-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110615

2010-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070405

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU