Global Patent Index - EP 1840233 A1

EP 1840233 A1 2007-10-03 - Aluminium alloy for cast parts

Title (en)

Aluminium alloy for cast parts

Title (de)

Aluminiumlegierung für Gussteil

Title (fr)

Alliage d' aluminium pour pièce coulée

Publication

EP 1840233 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06025641 A

Priority

DE 102006014976 A

Abstract (en)

Aluminum alloy for cast parts containing wt.% of Si (6.0 -7.5) , Mg (0.14-0.2), Ti (0.1-0.18), and Fe 0.005 , and P, Pb, Sb, Sn, Sr, V, Zr as impurities. The alloy can contain 0.0004-0.0015 wt.% boron. Independent claims are included for listing a cast carrier with a shock absorbing receiver and strengthening ribs, carrier production process by sand- or vacuum pressure casting.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung stellt eine Aluminiumlegierung zum Gießen, insbesondere für das Sandguss- oder Vakuumdruckgussverfahren, bereit mit 6,0 - 7,5 Gew.-% Silizium, 0,14 - 0,2 Gew.-% Magnesium, 0,1- 0,18 Gew.-% Titan, weniger als 0,005 Gew.-% Eisen, und als Rest Aluminium und unvermeidliche Verunreinigungen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); B22D 18/06 (2006.01); B22D 21/00 (2006.01); B22D 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 21/007 (2013.01); B22D 18/06 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840233 A1 20071003; EP 1840233 B1 20100310; DE 102006014976 A1 20071004; DE 502006006391 D1 20100422

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171204

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111212

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111212

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100310

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101213

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 5

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006006391 P 20100422

2010-03-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DR. ING. H.C. F. PORSCHE AG

2010-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

2010-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DR. ING. H.C. F. PORSCHE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080513

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080403

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DR. ING. H.C. F. PORSCHE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU