Global Patent Index - EP 1840251 A1

EP 1840251 A1 2007-10-03 - Rotary dobby, weaving loom equipped with such a dobby and driving element for such a dobby

Title (en)

Rotary dobby, weaving loom equipped with such a dobby and driving element for such a dobby

Title (de)

Rotationsschaftmaschine, mit einer solchen Schaftmaschine ausgestattete Webmaschine und Antriebselement für eine solche Schaftmaschine

Title (fr)

Ratière rotative, métier à tisser équipé d'une telle ratière et élément d'entraînement pour une telle ratière

Publication

EP 1840251 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07356036 A

Priority

FR 0602830 A

Abstract (en)

The rotating dobby for weaving loom, comprises blades, an oscillating part fixed with a harness and associated with an actuating element mounted on a main shaft of the dobby, and a movable coupling body carried by a tray integrated with a coupling element. The movable body is subjected to first elastic means for operating an angular joint of the plate with a driving element (7) rotating with main shaft, where the driving element is equipped with notches (72) diametrically opposed to finger plate of the coupling body. The finger plate is contacted with edges of the notches. The rotating dobby for weaving loom, comprises blades, an oscillating part fixed with a harness and associated with an actuating element mounted on a main shaft of the dobby, and a movable coupling body carried by a tray integrated with the coupling element. The movable body is subjected to first elastic means for operating an angular joint of the plate with a driving element (7) rotating with main shaft, where the driving element is equipped with notches (72) diametrically opposed to finger plate of the coupling body. The finger plate is contacted with edges of the notches in which the finger is engaged at a first interface defined between a first lateral side of the finger and a first edge of the notch and engaged at a second interface defined between a second lateral side of the finger and a second edge of the notch. A braking effort and a motive force for rotating the tray is transmitted to the movable body. A height of an orthogonal projection of the second interface on a bisector of lateral sides (811, 812) of the finger or on a bisector of edges (721, 722) of the notch is greater than a height of an orthogonal projection of the first interface on the same bisector. A height of the orthogonal projection of the second edge on the bisector of edges of each notch is greater than a radial height of the orthogonal projection of first edge of the notch on the same bisector. The orthogonal projections of lateral sides of finger on the bisector and orthogonal projections of edges of notches on the bisector have substantially same height. A side end of finger of the movable body is complementary of a portion of an external radial surface of the driving element in a vicinity of the second edge of each of its notches, and complementary of a base of the notch. A height of the orthogonal projection of second lateral side of the finger on the bisector of lateral sides of that finger is greater than a height of the orthogonal projection of the first lateral side of the finger on the same bisector. The bisector of first and second lateral sides of the finger and/or bisector of first and second edges of each notch are merged with a radius with respect to a geometric axis of rotation of a driving shaft. The first and second lateral sides of the finger and first and second edges of each notch are parallel to radius with respect to the geometric axis of rotation of the driving shaft and are merged with the bisectors of sides of the finger and edges of the notch. Independent claims are included for: (1) a weaving loom; and (2) a driving element.

Abstract (fr)

Cette ratière rotative comprend, pour chacune de ses lames, un organe mobile d'accouplement porté par un plateau. Un élément d'entraînement (7) est pourvu de deux encoches (72) diamétralement opposées de réception d'un doigt (81) de l'organe d'accouplement. Le doigt (81) est apte à venir en contact avec les bords (721, 722) d'une encoche (72) dans laquelle il est engagé au niveau d'une première interface (I 1 ), par laquelle est transmis à l'organe mobile un effort moteur (F 5 ), et d'une seconde interface (I 2 ), par laquelle est transmis à l'organe mobile un effort de freinage (F 6 ) . La hauteur (H 2 ) de la projection orthogonale (I' 2 ), de la seconde interface (I 2 ) sur la bissectrice (B 1 ) des faces latérales (811, 812) du doigt (81) ou sur la bissectrice (B 2 ) des bords (721, 722) de l'encoche (72) est supérieure à la hauteur (H 1 ) de la projection orthogonale (I' 1 ) de la première interface (I 1 ) sur la même bissectrice (B 1 , B 2 ).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2006.01); D03C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2013.01); D03C 1/14 (2013.01); D03C 1/144 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840251 A1 20071003; EP 1840251 B1 20090819; AT 440161 T 20090915; CN 101046022 A 20071003; CN 101046022 B 20120201; DE 602007001990 D1 20091001; FR 2899244 A1 20071005; FR 2899244 B1 20080613

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170308

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170308

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-09-28 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100220

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100326

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110326

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110326

2011-04-29 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100326

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-10-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100520

2010-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-04-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091221

2010-03-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-03-16 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-02-26 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-02-26 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-02-26 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-01-29 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091219

2010-01-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-10-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007001990 P 20091001

2009-09-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080814

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080204

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU