Global Patent Index - EP 1840261 A1

EP 1840261 A1 2007-10-03 - Method for manufacturing a cylinder

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a cylinder

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Walze

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un cylindre

Publication

EP 1840261 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07013737 A

Priority

  • EP 06111988 A
  • DE 102005040869 A

Abstract (en)

The roll manufacturing process involves applying at least one welding layer to a weldable-steel base tube and subjecting the coating to a suitable heat treatment to improve its properties. This may be an annealing treatment. The properties suitable for improvement include toughness, joint structure, shape stability, residual stress and hardness.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Walze für den Einsatz bei der Papierherstellung angegeben, bei dem auf ein Grundrohr aus schweißbarem Stahl zumindest eine Schweißschicht aufgebracht wird und die endgültigen Werkstoffeigenschaften der Beschichtung nach dem Schweißauftrag durch eine entsprechende Wärmebehandlung eingestellt werden.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0246 (2013.01); D21F 5/021 (2013.01); D21G 1/0253 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1760193 A2 20070307; EP 1760193 A3 20070718; EP 1760193 B1 20111123; AT 532900 T 20111115; AT 534766 T 20111215; DE 102005040869 A1 20070308; EP 1840261 A1 20071003; EP 1840261 B1 20111109; US 2007057019 A1 20070315

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130330

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502006010582

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 532900 T

- Effective date: 20130330

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130330

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-12-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006010582

- Effective date: 20120810

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120810

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-01-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-01-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006010582

- Effective date: 20120112

2011-11-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1760193 P

2011-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2011-10-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110908

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2007-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WIEMER, PETER, DR. RER. NAT.

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONRAD, HANS-ROLF

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOEFFLER, CHRISTIAN

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAUMEISTER, THOMAS

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKERS, RALF

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AUTRATA, JOCHEN

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINDER, HEIKO

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DRIES, OLAF

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ESSLING, ANDREAS

2007-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MICHELKENS, FRANZ-JOSEF

2007-10-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1760193 P

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU