Global Patent Index - EP 1840267 A2

EP 1840267 A2 2007-10-03 - Device and method for injecting cement grout in porous road surfaces

Title (en)

Device and method for injecting cement grout in porous road surfaces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Einspritzen von Zementschlamm in poröse Straßenbeläge

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé d'injection de coulis de ciment dans les revêvements routiers poreux

Publication

EP 1840267 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07290381 A

Priority

FR 0602842 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an agitator (2) for a cement grout arranged on a timber elevator type engine (3) for permitting final mixing of the grout with a water quantity and flux on installation place of the device. An applicator (5) is connected to a trailer (4) for injecting the grout in porous bituminous road surfaces (6) in which injection pressure of the grout is built up by a level (11) of the grout stored in an upper part of the applicator above the surface. The applicator is connected to the agitator by a pipe (21) tiltable with respect to elevation of the agitator by the engine. An independent claim is also included for a method for injecting cement grout in porous road surfaces.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif et procédé d'injection de coulis de ciment dans les revêtements routiers poreux, le dispositif étant constitué d'un engin de type chariot élévateur (3) et d'une remorque (4) caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte un agitateur (2) à toupie pour le coulis disposé sur le chariot élévateur (3) pour permettre le mélange final du coulis de ciment, sur le lieu d'utilisation du dispositif, avec une quantité d'eau et de fluidifiant déterminée et relié à un camion (1) d'approvisionnement en coulis de ciment de base, au moins un applicateur (5) lié à la remorque (4) injectant le coulis dans le revêtement (6) à rénover, dans lequel la pression d'injection du coulis est créée par la hauteur (11) de coulis emmagasinée dans la partie supérieure de l'applicateur (5) au dessus de la surface (6) à rénover, l'applicateur (5) étant relié à l'agitateur (2) par une tuyauterie (21) inclinable en fonction de l'élévation de l'agitateur (2) par le chariot élévateur (3), et au moins un type de moyens de raclage du coulis injecté, formant une deuxième ceinture autour de l'applicateur (5).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1840267 A2 20071003; EP 1840267 A3 20130102; FR 2899250 A1 20071005; FR 2899250 B1 20080620

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-10-24 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130904

2013-09-04 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-09-04 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2013-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2013-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E01C 19/47 20060101AFI20121126BHEP

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU